+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Public Policy
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Grooms added as cosponsor.
- Senator Arnold added as third sponsor.
- Senator Steele added as second sponsor.
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator Glick added as first sponsor.
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 207: yeas 94 and nays 1
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- HB 1387 Amendment #2 (Dermody), prevailed.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Dermody added as coauthor.
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Messmer.
- Coauthored by Representatives Koch, Austin
- First Reading: Referred to Public Policy
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor