+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Public Law 164
On March 21, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 368: yeas 70, nays 22
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 371: yeas 36, nays 13
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Rogers, Lanane and Mishler
- Senate conferees appointed: Glick and Tallian
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- House conferees appointed: Eberhart and Pfaff
- House advisors appointed: Prescott, Karickhoff and Errington
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 317: yeas 48, nays 0
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as cosponsor
- Senator Crider added as second sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Glick
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Coauthored by Representatives Pfaff and Prescott
- Authored by Representative Eberhart