+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 251
- Signed by the Governor
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Smith V removed as conferee
- Representative DeVon removed as advisor
- Representative DeVon added as conferee
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton removed as conferee
- Senator Kruse added as conferee
- Senator Kruse removed as advisor
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 529: yeas 38, nays 12
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 549: yeas 68, nays 30
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Stoops, Bassler, Crane and Zay
- Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Cook, DeVon, DeLaney, Errington and Pryor
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 373: yeas 36, nays 12
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Melton) failed; Roll Call 336: yeas 9, nays 37
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Bassler added as cosponsor
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Kruse
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 60, nays 32
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 194: yeas 91, nays 2
- Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 193: yeas 31, nays 60
- Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 192: yeas 30, nays 63
- Amendment #1 (Pryor) prevailed; Roll Call 191: yeas 92, nays 0
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Authored by Representative Behning
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor