+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 25, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 210
- Signed by the Governor
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 360: yeas 59, nays 21
- Motion to concur filed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 331: yeas 42, nays 7
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #5 (Merritt) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
- Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux removed as cosponsor
- Senator Randolph removed as cosponsor
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed back on second reading
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 91, nays 0
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Richardson added as coauthor
- Representative Hatfield added as coauthor
- Amendment #4 (Kersey) failed; Roll Call 123: yeas 26, nays 58
- Amendment #1 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Moseley) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
- Authored by Representative Slager