+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 282
On May 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 532: yeas 36, nays 14
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 579: yeas 76, nays 20
- Rules suspended
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate advisor appointed: Yoder and Rogers
- Senate conferee appointed: Banks and Taylor
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Clere, Behning, V. Smith and Battles
- House conferees appointed: Karickhoff and Austin
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 43 and nays 7
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Taylor added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder added as second sponsor
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Banks
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 186: yeas 85, nays 11
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 1 (Karickhoff), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Coauthored by Representatives Clere, Mahan and Austin
- Authored by Representative Karickhoff
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment 1381-D
Filed
House Amendment 1381-1
Passed