+ − Summary
+ − Actions (23)
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senators Lanane and Niezgodski added as cosponsors
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Moed added as coauthor
- Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Koch
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 58, nays 38
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment #11 (Saunders) failed; Roll Call 131: yeas 26, nays 68
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #12 (Negele) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #15 (Hamilton) motion withdrawn
- Amendment #13 (Judy) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #6 (Pryor) ruled out of order
- Amendment #14 (Judy) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Saunders) failed; voice vote
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Negele added as coauthor
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
- Authored by Representative Soliday