+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 522: yeas 67 and nays 30
- Public Law 190
- Representative Thompson added as conferee
- Representative Thompson removed as advisor
- Representative Porter removed as conferee
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 468: yeas 40 and nays 8
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Stemler added as advisor
- Representative Porter added as conferee
- Representative Thompson added as advisor
- Representative Ober added as advisor
- Representative Turner added as conferee
- Representative Goodin added as advisor
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Hershman added as conferee
- Senator Skinner added as conferee
- Senator Holdman added as advisor
- Senator Hume added as advisor
- Senator Kenley added as advisor
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 338: yeas 41 and nays 6
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Representative C. Brown added as coauthor.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- HB 1380 Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
- HB 1380 Amendment #3 (Kenley), prevailed.
- HB 1380 Amendment #4 (Kenley), prevailed.
- HB 1380 Amendment #5 (Kenley), prevailed.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- Senator Holdman added second sponsor.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Appropriations
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 206: yeas 94 and nays 0
- Senator Hershman added as first sponsor.
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass amend, adopted.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means
- Authored by Representative Turner.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor