+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 208
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Crider added as second sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 405: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Doriot
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 93, nays 2
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Soliday and Frye added as coauthors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reassigned to Committee on Roads and Transportation
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
- Authored by Representative Lehman