+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 188
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 396: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 424: yeas 96, nays 0
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Taylor
- Senate Advisors appointed: Buck, Tallian and Raatz
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees appointed: Lehman and Riecken
- House Advisors appointed: Miller D, Cox and Pryor
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 49, nays 1
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Eckerty added as second sponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 46: yeas 92, nays 0
- Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Lehman
- Coauthored by Representatives Truitt and Riecken
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform