+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 90
- Signed by the Governor
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 461: yeas 89, nays 0
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 312: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Walker
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 92, nays 1
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Representatives Frye and Forestal added as coauthors
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Macer added as coauthor
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
- Authored by Representative Smith M