+ − Summary
+ − Actions (47)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Public Law 193
- Signed by the Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 476: yeas 49, nays 0
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 480: yeas 85, nays 2
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Wesco and Pfaff
- House advisors appointed: Manning, Payne and Pierce
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Ford J.D.
- Senate advisors appointed: Walker G and Qaddoura
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 279: yeas 48, nays 1
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment #11 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #12 (Walker G) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #13 (Walker G) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #5 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 251: yeas 10, nays 39
- Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; Roll Call 252: yeas 13, nays 36
- Amendment #14 (Breaux) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 250: yeas 10, nays 39
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Walker G
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 83, nays 13
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment #10 (Pierce) failed; voice vote
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Amendment #11 (Pfaff) failed; Roll Call 60: yeas 28, nays 66
- Amendment #1 (Errington) failed; Roll Call 61: yeas 24, nays 70
- Amendment #8 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 62: yeas 24, nays 67
- Amendment #12 (Pryor) failed; Roll Call 63: yeas 29, nays 61
- Amendment #5 (Boy) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Boy) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Boy) failed; Roll Call 64: yeas 25, nays 61
- Amendment #4 (Boy) failed; Roll Call 65: yeas 26, nays 66
- Amendment #6 (Boy) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #7 (Boy) failed; voice vote
- Representative Manning added as coauthor
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
- Authored by Representative Wesco