+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Public Law 26
- Signed by the Governor
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Stoops added as cosponsor
- Senator Crider added as second sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to committee on
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Representatives Brown, C., Morris, Pryor added as coauthorss
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senator Yoder added first sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #2 (Forestal) failed;
- Amendment #1 (Forestal) failed;
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Coauthored by Representative Soliday
- Authored by Representative Sullivan