+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 83
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 312: yeas 45, nays 3
- Senator Becker added as cosponsor
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senators Niezgodski and Qaddoura added as cosponsors
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Senators Charbonneau, Brown L, Ford Jon added as cosponsors
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 86, nays 2
- Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers and Kruse
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Goodrich
- Coauthored by Representatives Behning, Prescott, Pryor
- First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 141
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 2
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 312
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor