+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 84
- Signed by the Governor
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 49, nays 0
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 111: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Negele, Wright, Porter added as coauthors
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Authored by Representative Cherry