+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 301: yeas 20, nays 29
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Raatz) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Morris added as coauthor
- Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 110: yeas 88, nays 3
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Stemler added as coauthor
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Coauthored by Representative Lehman
- Authored by Representative Mahan