+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (66)
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 467: yeas 24 and nays 24
- Senator Steele added as conferee
- Senator Steele removed as advisor
- Senator Tallian removed as conferee
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Representative VanNatter added as conferee
- Representative Riecken removed as conferee
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 517: yeas 81 and nays 17
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Bartlett added as advisor
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
- Representative McMillin added as conferee
- Representative Koch added as advisor
- Representative Cox added as advisor
- Representative Riecken added as conferee
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator M. Young added as conferee
- Senator Steele added as advisor
- Senator Hume added as advisor
- Senator Yoder added as advisor
- Senator Smith added as advisor
- Senator Tallian added as conferee
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 334: yeas 34 and nays 14
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- HB 1351 Amendment #2 (Young, M.), prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 32, nays 11.
- HB 1351 Amendment #3 (Young, M.), prevailed.
- HB 1351 Amendment #4 (Young, M.), prevailed.
- HB 1351 Amendment #5 (Taylor), failed.
- HB 1351 Amendment #1 (Tallian), failed.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
- Senator Smith added as cosponsor.
- Senator Hershman added as cosponsor.
- Senator Mishler added third sponsor.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Appropriations
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Ubelhor added as coauthor.
- Representative Burton added as coauthor.
- Representative Braun added as coauthor.
- Representative Turner added as coauthor.
- Representative Speedy added as coauthor.
- Representative VanNatter added as coauthor.
- Representative Morris added as coauthor.
- Representative Lucas added as coauthor.
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator Yoder added as second sponsor.
- Senator Young R Michael added as sponsor.
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 100: yeas 71 and nays 22
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- HB 1351 Amendment #2 (Riecken) motion withdrawn.
- HB 1351 Amendment #6 (McMillin), failed.
- HB 1351 Amendment #7 (McMillin), prevailed.
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Mahan added as coauthor.
- Representative DeVon added as coauthor.
- Representative Rhoads added as coauthor.
- Representative Smaltz added as coauthor.
- Representative Huston added as coauthor.
- Representative Ober added as coauthor.
- Representative Frye added as coauthor.
- Representative Harman added as coauthor.
- Representative Neese added as coauthor.
- Representative Culver added as coauthor.
- Representative Messmer added as coauthor.
- Representative Kubacki added as coauthor.
- Representative Koch added as coauthor.
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Family, Children and Human Affairs
- Authored by Representative McMillin.
+ − Amendments (12)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor