+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 424: yeas 37, nays 10
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Raatz, Melton, Doriot and Ruckelshaus
- Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Niezgodski
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Sullivan, Ober, Lindauer, Forestal and DeLaney
- House conferees appointed: Soliday and Hatfield
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 328: yeas 49, nays 0
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Raatz added as second sponsor
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as cosponsor
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Lindauer, Frye, Forestal added as coauthors
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
- Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 94, nays 0
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Hatfield added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
- Coauthored by Representatives Sullivan and Ober
- Authored by Representative Soliday
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor