+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Rogers and Lanane
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Bacon added as advisor
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Taylor G
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: DeVon, Morrison, Pressel and Pierce
- House conferees appointed: Speedy and Hamilton
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 486: yeas 31, nays 14
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #5 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Senator Stoops added as cosponsor
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Merritt
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 223: yeas 90, nays 6
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Torr and Pierce added as coauthors
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Hamilton added as coauthor
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
- Authored by Representative Speedy