+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 71
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 363: yeas 49 and nays 0
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 97, nays 0
- Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss, Arnold and Merritt
- Referred to the Senate
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Gutwein added as coauthor
- Representative Niemeyer removed as coauthor
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Representative McMillin added as coauthor
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Representatives Niemeyer and Forestal added as coauthors
- First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
- Authored by Representative Frye
+ − Votes (4)
April 2, 2013: Roll Call No. 363
March 28, 2013: Roll Call No. 7959
February 18, 2013: Roll Call No. 141
February 12, 2013: Roll Call No. 7820
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor