+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 187
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 395: yeas 49, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 376: yeas 98, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Smith M, Engleman and Harris
- House conferees appointed: Slager and Pryor
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Messmer, Randolph Lonnie M and Glick
- Senate conferees appointed: Niemeyer and Taylor G
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 327: yeas 48, nays 0
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Zakas) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 91, nays 0
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Miller added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Pryor added as coauthor
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Authored by Representative Slager