+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 122
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 94, nays 0
- Motion to concur filed
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Niemeyer and Lanane
- Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Randolph Lonnie M
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Karickhoff, Engleman and Klinker
- House conferees appointed: Olthoff and Pryor
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 307: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as cosponsor
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Niemeyer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 92, nays 0
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Clere added as coauthor
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Coauthored by Representatives Karickhoff and Davisson J.
- Authored by Representative Olthoff
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2022: Roll Call 147
- Yeas: 92
January 31, 2022: Roll Call 307
- Yeas: 48
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor