+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 207
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 537: yeas 92, nays 0
- Motion to concur filed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 426: yeas 48, nays 0
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Garten added as second sponsor
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Glick
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 96, nays 0
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Bauer and Baird added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representative Clere
- Authored by Representative Zent