+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 79
- Signed by the Governor
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 306: yeas 41, nays 7
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Messmer added as second sponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Mayfield added as coauthor
- Senate sponsor: Senator Alting
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 92, nays 1
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Authored by Representative Smaltz
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 306
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 7
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 63
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1