+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Public Law 206
- Signed by the Governor
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 395: yeas 49, nays 1
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 423: yeas 92, nays 2
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Buck, Taylor and Head
- Senate Conferees appointed: Bray and Broden
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House Advisors appointed: Truitt, Cherry and Bartlett
- House Conferees appointed: Negele and Errington
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 39, nays 6
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Bray) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as second sponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Nisly and Errington added as coauthors
- Senate sponsor: Senator Bray
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Lyness) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Truitt added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Authored by Representative Negele