+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 175
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Carbaugh removed as author
- Representative Smaltz added as author
- Rule 105.2 suspended
- Representatives Abbott D, Baird, Barrett, Bartels, Behning, Borders, Carbaugh, Cherry, Cook, Davis M, Davisson J., DeVon, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Frye, Goodrich, Gutwein, Heaton, Heine, Hostettler, Huston, Jeter C, Jordan, Judy, King J, Lauer, Ledbetter C, Lehe, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, Miller, Morris, Morrison, Payne Z, Prescott, Snow C, Steuerwald, Teshka J, Thompson, VanNatter, Vermilion A, Wesco, Young J added as coauthors
- Representative Austin removed as conferee
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Ford Jon and Griffin removed as conferees
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Smaltz added as conferee
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 382: yeas 69, nays 30
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Koch and Tomes added as conferees
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 364: yeas 30, nays 20
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Griffin
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin
- House advisors appointed: Lehman and Campbell
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Walker K and Randolph Lonnie M
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 304: yeas 47, nays 1
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Zay added as second sponsor
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 91, nays 0
- Senate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Carbaugh
- First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
+ − Proposed Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2022: Roll Call 145
- Yeas: 91
January 31, 2022: Roll Call 304
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor