+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 23
- Signed by the Governor
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 277: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators Breaux, Brown L, Glick, Houchin, Tallian added as cosponsors
- Senator Becker added as second sponsor
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Ruckelshaus added as cosponsor
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Representatives Austin, Errington, Hamilton, Klinker, Lawson, Macer, McNamara, Olthoff, Pryor, Candelaria Reardon, Richardson, Schaibley, Siegrist, Wright, Ziemke, Zent, Clere, Brown, T., Slager added as coauthors
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Smaltz added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senate sponsor: Senator Leising
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 100, nays 0
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Representatives Sullivan, Kirchhofer, Summers added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Negele
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor