+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 145
- Signed by the Governor
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 296: yeas 44, nays 5
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Brown, C. added as coauthor
- Senate sponsor: Senator Kruse
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 93, nays 0
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Representative Olthoff added as coauthor
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
- Coauthored by Representative Miller D
- Authored by Representative Bartels