+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 6
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Returned to the House without amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 48 and nays 0
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Landske and Taylor
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 96, nays 0
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment 1 (Thompson), prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Pryor added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
- Authored by Representative Niemeyer
+ − Amendment
House Amendment 1276-1
Passed