+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Advisors appointed: Merritt, Taylor, Ford and Hershman
- Senate Conferees appointed: Miller Pete and Breaux
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Advisors appointed: Brown T, Ober, Moed, Pryor and DeLaney
- House Conferees appointed: Huston and Porter
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed;
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Breaux) failed;
- Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as third sponsor
- Senator Ford added as cosponsor
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to committee on
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Senator Merritt added as second sponsor
- Senator Miller, Pete added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #10 (Pryor) failed;
- Amendment #6 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #9 (Huston) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Representatives Ober, Kirchhofer, Moed added as coauthorss
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Representative Huston