+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 282
- Signed by the Governor
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 563: yeas 84, nays 2
- Motion to concur filed
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 484: yeas 40, nays 5
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Amendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Pressel, Aylesworth, Candelaria Reardon added as coauthors
- Senate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 97, nays 0
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction
- Authored by Representative Gutwein