+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Public Law 144
- Signed by the Governor
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 393: yeas 44, nays 4
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 374: yeas 98, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
- Representative Jordan added as coauthor
- Representative Zent added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Bohacek and Zakas added as advisors
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Brown L, Randolph Lonnie M and Ruckelshaus
- Senate conferees appointed: Head and Taylor G
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Washburne, Negele, Steuerwald, Hatfield and Austin
- House conferees appointed: Siegrist and Bartlett
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Crane and Buck added as cosponsors
- Senator Crider added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
- Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Ruckelshaus added as cosponsor
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Representatives Beumer, Culver, Engleman, Friend, Gutwein, Heine, Huston, Karickhoff, Lehe, Morrison, Negele, Ober, Olthoff, Richardson, Schaibley, Slager, Sullivan, Washburne, Young J, Brown, C., Errington, GiaQuinta, Hamilton, Harris, Pierce, Pryor, Wright added as coauthors
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 103: yeas 94, nays 0
- Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Brown L
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Representative Mayfield added as coauthor
- Representatives Burton, Frizzell, DeLaney added as coauthors
- Representative Torr added as coauthor
- Representative Bauer added as coauthor
- Representative Shackleford added as coauthor
- Representative Austin added as coauthor
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representatives McNamara, Bartlett and Hatfield
- Authored by Representative Siegrist
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor