+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 515: yeas 99 and nays 0
- Public Law 185
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 455: yeas 48 and nays 0
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Representative McMillin added as advisor
- Representative Steuerwald added as conferee
- Representative Pierce added as conferee
- Representative Harman added as advisor
- House dissented from Senate Amendments
- Representative Lawson added as advisor
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator M. Young added as conferee
- Senator Randolph added as conferee
- Senator Steele added as advisor
- Senator Taylor added as advisor
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 322: yeas 47 and nays 0
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Senator Steele added as second sponsor.
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 92 and nays 1
- Referred to the Senate
- Senator Young R. Michael added as sponsor.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representatives McMillin, Pierce, Lawson L
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Steuerwald.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor