+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Public Law 79
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 374: yeas 89, nays 0
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Miller Patricia) prevailed; voice vote
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health & Provider Services
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Miller, Pat and Crider
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 94, nays 0
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Frye, Ellington J, Forestal added as coauthors
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
- Authored by Representative Kirchhofer