+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 11
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 363: yeas 93, nays 0
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 47 and nays 0
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Dvorak added as coauthor
- Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Arnold
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 97, nays 0
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Coauthored by Representative Pelath
- Authored by Representative Dermody
+ − Amendment
House Amendment 1261-C
Filed