+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Law 5
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 268: yeas 49 and nays 0
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Steele and Arnold
- Referred to the Senate
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 99, nays 0
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Representative Lawson added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative Dermody