+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 168
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 375: yeas 33, nays 17
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers removed as advisor
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Goodrich removed as advisor
- Representative Smith V removed as conferee
- Representative Goodrich added as conferee
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
- Senator Rogers added as conferee
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 395: yeas 70, nays 28
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to dissent filed
- House dissented from Senate amendments
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Ford J.D.
- Senate advisors appointed: Byrne, Qaddoura and Rogers
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Clere, Goodrich and DeLaney
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 34, nays 14
- Senator Kruse added as second sponsor
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Amendment #7 (Young M) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 271: yeas 12, nays 38
- Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 272: yeas 12, nays 38
- Amendment #6 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 273: yeas 14, nays 36
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 73, nays 17
- Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 132: yeas 28, nays 63
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Representatives Carbaugh, Davis M, Goodrich added as coauthors
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Behning
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
+ − Adopted Amendments (25)
+ − Proposed Amendments (30)
+ − Votes (2)
January 31, 2022: Roll Call 159
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 17
January 31, 2022: Roll Call 302
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 14