+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 95
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 327: yeas 83, nays 6
- Motion to concur filed
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 47, nays 1
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Buchanan) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Senator Busch added as second sponsor
- Senator Rogers added as third sponsor
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Buchanan
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 87, nays 5
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Engleman added as coauthor
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
- Coauthored by Representatives Thompson and Cherry
- Authored by Representative Lehe
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 124
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 5
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 300
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1