+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public Law 81
- Signed by the Governor
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 407: yeas 90, nays 0
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 48, nays 0
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second sponsor
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Representatives Hatfield, Cook, Jordan, Behning, Burton, Clere, DeVon, Goodrich, Lucas, Thompson, Smith, V., DeLaney, Klinker added as coauthors
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 98, nays 0
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
- Authored by Representative Sullivan
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor