+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 166
- Signed by the Governor
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 351: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 362: yeas 94, nays 0
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Buck and Randolph Lonnie M
- Senate conferees appointed: Perfect and Breaux
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Abbott, Manning and Harris
- House conferees appointed: Miller D and Bartlett
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 298: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as third sponsor
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Perfect and Buck
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 89, nays 0
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Harris added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Bartlett added as coauthor
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Coauthored by Representative Pressel
- Authored by Representative Miller D
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 79
- Yeas: 89
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 298
- Yeas: 48