+ − Summary
+ − Actions (23)
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Public Law 58
- Signed by the Governor
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 320: yeas 89, nays 2
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Brown L added as second sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 47, nays 1
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 91, nays 2
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Representatives Lehman, GiaQuinta, Miller added as coauthors
- Amendment #1 (Bartlett) failed; Roll Call 22: yeas 37, nays 60
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Authored by Representative Heine