+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Public Law 165
- Signed by the Governor
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 350: yeas 49, nays 1
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 361: yeas 94, nays 0
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Carbaugh, Ellington, Schaibley and Campbell
- House conferees appointed: Lehman and Austin
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Bassler and Griffin
- Senate conferees appointed: Zay and Randolph Lonnie M
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Holdman added as second sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 47, nays 1
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Austin added as coauthor
- Senate sponsor: Senator Zay
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 94, nays 0
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
- Coauthored by Representative Carbaugh
- Authored by Representative Lehman
+ − Adopted Amendments (9)
+ − Proposed Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 237
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
January 24, 2022: Roll Call 60
- Yeas: 94