+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Senate sponsor: Senator Leising
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 70: yeas 94, nays 2
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Representatives Baird and Goodin added as coauthors
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
- Authored by Representative Lehe