+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 371: yeas 88, nays 1
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Senator Bray added as second sponsor
- Senator Bassler added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 95, nays 1
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Baird added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Representative Heaton
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor