+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public Law 86
- Signed by the Governor
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 475: yeas 77, nays 0
- Motion to concur filed
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 47, nays 0
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Sandlin added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Lanane added as cosponsor
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Eckerty added as cosponsor
- Senator Messmer added as third sponsor
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Porter added as coauthor
- Senate sponsors: Senators Head and Bray
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 96, nays 0
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Authored by Representative McNamara