+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 93
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 315: yeas 75, nays 17
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 38, nays 10
- Senator Crane added as cosponsor
- Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
- Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Senator Boehnlein added as cosponsor
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Donato added as cosponsor
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as second sponsor
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 101: yeas 73, nays 18
- Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #4 (King) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Austin) failed; voice vote
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Representatives Mayfield, Fleming, Jeter C added as coauthors
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative King
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
+ − Adopted Amendments (7)
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 101
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 18
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 235
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor