+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Public Law 49
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 419: yeas 87 and nays 0
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 312: yeas 41 and nays 7
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse removed second sponsor.
- HB 1213 Amendment #4 (Kruse), prevailed.
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
- Senator Charbonneau removed first sponsor.
- Senator Kruse added first sponsor.
- Senator Charbonneau added second sponsor.
- Senator Skinner added as cosponsor.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added second sponsor.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Representative VanDenburgh added as coauthor.
- Senator Charbonneau added as first sponsor.
- Representative Burton added as coauthor.
- Representative Pelath added as coauthor.
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 188: yeas 94 and nays 0
- Representative Lucas added as coauthor.
- Representative Klinker added as coauthor.
- Representative Arnold added as coauthor.
- Representative Zent added as coauthor.
- Referred to the Senate
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed
- Representative Battles added as coauthor.
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted.
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Bosma added as coauthor.
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Representative Messmer added as coauthor.
- Representative Truitt added as coauthor.
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Education
- Coauthored by Representative Mahan
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Authored by Representative McNamara.
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor