+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 370: yeas 31, nays 19
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 389: yeas 63, nays 28
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Perfect added as conferee
- Senator Melton removed as conferee
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Griffin
- Senate conferees appointed: Garten and Melton
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: O'Brien, Heaton and Campbell
- House conferees appointed: Teshka and Johnson
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Busch added as cosponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 47, nays 0
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators Baldwin, Donato, Koch, Perfect, Melton added as cosponsors
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Garten, Ford Jon, Ford J.D.
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 86, nays 0
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Representatives Miller and Johnson added as coauthors
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
- Coauthored by Representative O'Brien
- Authored by Representative Teshka
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 220
- Yeas: 47
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 52
- Yeas: 86
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor