+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 163
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to concur filed
- House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 325: yeas 75, nays 17
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 296: yeas 28, nays 20
- Senator Niezgodski removed as cosponsor
- Senator Ford Jon added as second sponsor
- Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
- Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On January 28, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 76, nays 13
- Senate sponsor: Senator Glick
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Soliday) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Dvorak) failed; Roll Call 112: yeas 29, nays 63
- Amendment #3 (Boy) failed; Roll Call 113: yeas 27, nays 65
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Abbott D added as coauthor
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Manning added as coauthor
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Representative Jackson added as coauthor
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Authored by Representative Soliday
- First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
+ − Adopted Amendments (9)
+ − Proposed Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (2)
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 140
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 13
January 27, 2022: Roll Call 296
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 20