+ − Summary
+ − Actions (23)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Boots and Tallian
- Senate conferees appointed: Bohacek and Taylor G
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Morris, Young J and Hatcher
- House conferees appointed: McNamara and Hatfield
- House dissented from Senate amendments
- Motion to dissent filed
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House with amendments
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 418: yeas 44, nays 5
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 39, nays 10
- Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 405: yeas 15, nays 35
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as cosponsor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Senate sponsors: Senators Bohacek and Boots
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 89, nays 7
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Representative Hatfield added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representative Morris
- Authored by Representative McNamara