+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House without amendments
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 272: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Tallian added as cosponsor
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Senate
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Senator Eckerty added as second sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 97, nays 0
- Senator Head added as sponsor
- Representative Austin added as coauthor
- Rule 105.1 suspended
- Representative Kirchhofer removed as coauthor
- Representatives Kirchhofer, Zent, Lawson, Hale, Riecken added as coauthors
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
- Coauthored by Representatives Olthoff, Steuerwald and Kirchhofer
- Authored by Representative McNamara
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor